Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Taxes - Authority of Counties to Establish a Subclass and Set a Special Rate for Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to establish, by law, a subclass of real property consisting of vacant lots or improved property cited as vacant and unfit for habitation or other authorized use on a housing or building violation notice and to set a special property tax rate for certain vacant lots or improved property cited as vacant and unfit for habitation or other authorized use; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0002
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2023
Legislative Date
10/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-10)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2023 10/03/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority to Set a Special Rate for Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Taxes - Authority of Counties to Establish a Subclass and Set a Special Rate for Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-10) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Ways and Means 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page