Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a member of a cooperative housing corporation to pay up to $10,000 of the corporation's property or liability insurance deductible if damage to a common element originated in the member's unit; requiring the governing body to inform each member annually of the member's responsibility regarding the insurance deductible and the amount; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 9:12 AM
Click to return on the top page