Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated by certain signage for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for certain purposes; authorizing the towing or removal of certain vehicles; establishing a civil penalty of $50 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0315 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page