Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number from one to two, the voting rights of, and the process for electing student members of the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners; and establishing the Task Force to Study Compensation for the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners and make recommendations regarding the amount of and revenue stream for any proposed compensation to begin with the Baltimore City budget for fiscal year 2024.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page