Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage - Tipped Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying a certain tip credit amount that is in effect for certain time periods; prohibiting certain employers of tipped employees, beginning July 1, 2027, from including a tip credit amount as part of the employees' wages and requiring the employer to pay an employee at least the State minimum wage; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to establish the High Road Kitchen Program as a recognition program for restaurants that do not include the tip credit as part of certain employees' wages.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0803 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage - Tipped Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage - Tipped Employees
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/2/2024 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page