Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Charles County Public Library to partner with an Imagination Library Program to provide free books to children up to 5 years of age; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2026 through 2035 an appropriation of $2.10 for each child registered in the Program for each month that the child is registered in the Program.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0108 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2024 5:02 PM
Click to return on the top page