Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Robinson, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Community Health Worker Advisory Committee to advise the Maryland Department of Health on matters relating to the certification and training of community health workers; requiring the Department to adopt regulations for accrediting certain training programs; requiring that certain written materials be in the preferred language of Advisory Committee members, as necessary; providing that, subject to an exception, a certified community health worker training program must be approved before operating in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {467178/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
(   13-3601 through 13-3609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page