Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Benson, Elfreth, Hayes, Kelley, McCray, Pinsky, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer to report specified criminal conduct of another police officer to a supervisor or police chief when the reporting officer has actual knowledge of the criminal conduct; prohibiting a police officer from knowingly and willfully violating the reporting requirement; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $10,000 or both for a violation of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:52 PM
Click to return on the top page