Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senators Ferguson, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, and Oaks
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying from 90 days to 1 year the time limit on the filing of a specified complaint with the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board; and requiring the complaint to be in writing on a form authorized by the Board and signed and sworn to, under penalty of perjury, by the complainant.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1037
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0829 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288772/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {963021/1 (Senator Oaks) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952116/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {288772/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {288772/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {963021/1 (Senator Oaks) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judiciary 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {952116/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
(   16-42, 16-43, 16-44 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page