Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to require an insurer that holds a certificate of authority to fulfill the holder's obligations or pay a claim or an amount due instead of, or in addition to, suspending or revoking the certificate; and authorizing the Commissioner, on a finding of a violation of certain provisions of law, to require an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, or a health maintenance organization to provide a payment that has been improperly denied.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:09 PM
Click to return on the top page