Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Kasemeyer, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Dental Action Coalition to conduct a study to determine the annual cost of emergency room visits to treat dental conditions of specified adults and whether it is advisable to expand benefits for dental services for specified adults under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing the Coalition to report to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the General Assembly the findings of the study by December 1, 2017 and distribute the report to specified stakeholders; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433522/2 (Delegate McKay) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions - Study
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {227279/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions - Study
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {433522/2 (Delegate McKay) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - Study
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text - Chapter - Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - Study
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page