Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for emancipation of a minor and authorization to marry; altering the conditions under which an individual who is 17 years old is authorized to marry; prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; requiring an applicant for a marriage license to provide a certain document to a clerk of the court; requiring a clerk of the court to review a certain order before issuing a marriage license under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0242
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:53 PM
Click to return on the top page