Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision that prohibits the Governor from appointing a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, a member of the Board of Directors of the Medical System Corporation, or an officer or a full-time employee of the Medical System Corporation or the University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus to the Emergency Medical Services Board; and prohibiting the Governor from appointing more than two persons in total from certain health systems and schools to the Emergency Medical Services Board.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277674/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Reassigned to Finance 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {277674/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator King) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Floor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator King) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {856087/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text - Chapter - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
(   13-503, 13-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page