Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a fiduciary institution to disclose certain financial records to an adult protective services program that is investigating suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; authorizing an adult protective services agency or a law enforcement agency to share certain information with a fiduciary institution that made a report of suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page