Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the federal No Surprises Act and certain other provisions of the federal Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 regarding transparency apply to certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations; and authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-146 )
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page