Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept an application for the homeowners' property tax credit submitted by a homeowner within 1 year after April 15 of the taxable year for which the credit is sought if the homeowner is applying for the credit for the first time or has filed a timely application for the credit for the 3 immediately preceding taxable years.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 10:51 AM
Click to return on the top page