Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Peters, and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for recall of a former judge in Baltimore City, Charles County, Harford County, and Prince George's County for temporary assignment.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1344
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Charles and Prince George's Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {838378/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page