Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the collective bargaining process for State employees, including by requiring the selection of a neutral arbitrator to oversee all aspects of collective bargaining, establishing a process of arbitration in the event of impasse, and providing that certain decisions of a neutral arbitrator are advisory; requiring that each budget bill contain the appropriations necessary to implement all terms and conditions of employment in certain memoranda of understanding for the next ensuing fiscal year; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0114
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0218 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2023
Legislative Date
10/25/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2023 10/25/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page