Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the House - Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0543
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0179 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/15/2020
Legislative Date
9/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/09 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {493325/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-96)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/15/2020 9/15/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {582517/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Motion Special Order until 04/09 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Floor Amendment {493325/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-96) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:01 AM
Click to return on the top page