Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "economic development program" for purposes of certain data collection, tracking, and reporting requirements of the Maryland Jobs Development Act to include certain tax credit programs; altering certain information that the Department of Commerce is required to report in accordance with the Act; altering certain reporting requirements relating to certain economic development programs and income tax credits administered by the Department; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/14/2021
Legislative Date
10/14/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/14/2021 10/14/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page