Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the termination date for certain provisions of law concerning the Minority Business Enterprise Program; and altering the date by which the final report on a certain study of the Minority Business Enterprise Program is required to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee of the General Assembly to before September 30, 2023 so that the General Assembly may review the report before the 2024 Session.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
(   2012, 2013, 2017 )
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page