Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senator Lewis Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain farm owner or operator from knowingly confining egg-laying hens in an enclosure in a certain manner, subject to certain exceptions, on and after January 1, 2026; prohibiting a business owner or operator or a farm owner or operator from selling shell eggs or egg products under certain circumstances on and after January 1, 2026; and specifying that a certain certification verifying that the shell eggs and egg products are produced in a certain manner must be obtained before selling shell eggs and egg products.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0357
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0690 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/31/2023
Legislative Date
8/31/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/31/2023 8/31/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-1101 through 3-1106, 4-301   )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page