Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain death benefit may be awarded; providing that an application for a death benefit under the Act shall be submitted within 3 years of the finding of evidence that the death of the decedent resulted from an act committed against the decedent by another due to the nature and performance of the decedent's duties; and applying the Act retroactively.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page