Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the University of Maryland University College to be the University of Maryland Global Campus; requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland, in consultation with and subject to the approval of the Department of Legislative Services, to correct cross-references and terminology rendered incorrect by the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
(   13-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page