Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date to September 30, 2032, for provisions of law relating to the Spay/Neuter Fund.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:36 PM
Click to return on the top page