Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the types of commuter benefits for which a business entity may claim a tax credit to include a certain carpool program, telework program, active transportation program, and multimodal commuter program.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page