Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Reducing Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Hester, Elfreth, Hettleman, Brooks, Kagan, Lewis Young, and Watson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, by April 1, 2026, and every 5 years thereafter, producers of certain packaging materials to individually or as part of a producer responsibility organization submit a producer responsibility plan to the Department of the Environment for review and approval in accordance with certain requirements; prohibiting, on or after a certain date, a producer of certain packaging materials from selling or distributing the materials unless the producer has an approved producer responsibility plan on file with the Department; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0284
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0307 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Reducing Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933629/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {743628/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {423621/1 (Senator James) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {243329/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Reducing Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Environment - Reducing Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {933629/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments {933629/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Floor Amendment {743628/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Floor Amendment {423621/1 (Senator James) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Floor Amendment {243329/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Reducing Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-1702,   9-1702.2, 9-1707,   9-2501 through 9-2510 )
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page