Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection Panel
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Feldman, Kelley, Lee, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Selection Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Panel; requiring the Panel to develop a plan for and conduct a specified State song competition, including an online voting platform, and to carry out specified tasks relating to the competition; requiring the Panel to report the winner of the State song competition to the Governor and the General Assembly and to recommend specified legislation on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page