Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care and Dementia Care Navigation Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Hester, Ellis, Gile, Griffith, Hayes, Hershey, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Mautz, and Ready
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Aging to oversee and train the staff of long-term care and dementia care navigation programs; requiring each area agency to establish a long-term care and dementia care navigation program; requiring the Department to submit a report, by October 1, 2024, and each year thereafter, to the Governor, the Speaker of the House, the President of the Senate, and certain committees on the services provided under the Act; and requiring the Department to publish the report on its website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Aging - Dementia Care Coordinator and Dementia Care Navigation Programs
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {493425/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Aging - Long-Term Care and Dementia Care Navigation Programs
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
(   10-101,   10-1301 through 10-1303 )
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page