Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving in certain positions in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the calculation of a certain benefit from the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for individuals serving in certain positions on or before June 30, 2022; requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before January 1, 2023, to notify the individuals who are affected by the Act of their right to transfer certain service credit; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0778 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 10:47 AM
Click to return on the top page