Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Library)
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county public library from charging a minor a fine for overdue library materials; prohibiting a county public library from charging a minor a replacement fee for overdue library materials until 21 days after the date on which the library materials were due; and providing that a public library is not required to refund a replacement fee for overdue library materials returned after a replacement fee has been paid.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0208
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1246 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/10/2023
Legislative Date
9/10/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/10/2023 9/10/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Referred Ways and Means 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2024 1:02 PM
Click to return on the top page