Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Department of Emergency Management)
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring certain duties relating to the Volunteer Company Assistance Fund from the Military Department to the Maryland Department of Emergency Management.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2023
Legislative Date
9/18/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2023 9/18/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
Senate 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Volunteer Company Assistance Fund - Alterations
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 8:08 AM
Click to return on the top page