Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Edwards, Klausmeier, Norman, Ready, Young, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county health department to issue a mobile reciprocity license to a specified mobile food service facility; authorizing a county health department to charge a fee not exceeding $300 for a mobile reciprocity license; providing that a mobile reciprocity license is valid for 1 year; prohibiting a county from requiring that a mobile food service facility be inspected before a county health department issues a mobile reciprocity license if the mobile food service facility has been inspected by the county of origin; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0771
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {117272/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page