Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Program - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee (By Request - Critical Area Commission)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the enforcement and after-the-fact application approval procedures required as minimum elements of a local jurisdiction's Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Program to apply to all critical area violations; repealing the 30-day waiting period with which the Chair of the Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays must comply before referring certain enforcement matters to the Attorney General; and expanding the authority of the Attorney General to take certain equitable actions.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/15/2023
Legislative Date
9/15/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/15/2023 9/15/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Program - Enforcement
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/21/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Program - Enforcement
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 1:05 PM
Click to return on the top page