Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Middleton, Peters, Rosapepe, Astle, Hershey, Jennings, Oaks, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain fertility preservation procedures; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0908
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0918 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {656786/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737070/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {656786/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Text - Chapter -
(   15-810.1, 31-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page