Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Middleton
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the manufacturer of a nonwoven disposable product from, beginning January 1, 2018, advertising or labeling the nonwoven disposable product in a specified manner unless the nonwoven disposable product is flushable; and requiring the manufacturer of a nonwoven disposable product to label a nonwoven disposable product in a specified manner beginning January 1, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
(   9-258 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page