Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Feldman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization; requiring the Task Force to study the practices of remote notarization and electronic notarization in other jurisdictions and to make recommendations regarding the feasibility of authorizing remote notarization or electronic notarization in the State and on reasonable fees for services; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Secretary of State, and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0985
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {878771/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page