Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the fee required to be assessed by the Motor Vehicle Administration against an applicant for registration of a motor vehicle who had previously been refused due to an outstanding warrant.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0072
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/10/2023
Legislative Date
9/10/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/10/2023 9/10/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration - Fee Due to Outstanding Warrant - Repeal
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2024 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page