Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the timing of the annual election of the officers of the Talbot County Board of Education; requiring the county board to elect a president and vice president from among its member at its last meeting at the end of each calendar year, or at the meeting in December each year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page