Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, Pinsky, Ramirez, Smith, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Environmental Service, consistent with specified provisions of law, to recognize and deal with an employee organization once elected as an exclusive representative, to collectively bargain, and to enter into specified types of agreements applicable to specified State employees; and providing for an exception to an exemption from specified provisions of State personnel law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {213820/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-94)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {223326/3 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (49-89)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {223326/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-90)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate McComas) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McComas) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {983422/3 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (49-88)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-46)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Appropriations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Amendment {213820/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-94) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Amendment {223326/3 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (49-89) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {223326/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-90) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate McComas) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McComas) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {983422/3 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (49-88) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-46) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text - Chapter - Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
(   3-103.1, 3-103.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page