Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Continuing the Board for Professional Land Surveyors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2034 the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2023
Legislative Date
9/08/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2023 9/08/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2024 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page