Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Ready
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families, and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit its findings annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30; requiring the Commission to study developing a process and framework for implementing an Adverse Childhood Experiences (ACEs) Aware Program in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0548
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0918 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {727079/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 22AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
(   8-1301 through 8-1310 )
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:39 PM
Click to return on the top page