Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Jennings, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who causes personal injury or wrongful death while operating or attempting to operate a motor vehicle and who has a specified alcohol concentration in the person's blood or breath or who refuses to submit to a specified test for alcohol concentration is liable for punitive damages under specified circumstances; requiring a party who seeks to recover punitive damages under the Act to plead specified facts with particularity; providing for a standard of proof of clear and convincing evidence for a claim of punitive damages; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478978/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {522219/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Norman)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Norman)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Dumais and Malone)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {478978/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {522219/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Norman) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Norman) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Dumais and Malone) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-101, 21-902, 27-101, 27-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page