Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide, Kidnapping, and Drug Offenses - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Brochin, Cassilly, Norman, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum penalties for murder in the second degree, manslaughter, and kidnapping; prohibiting a person from distributing heroin mixed with fentanyl; establishing penalties; and requiring that a sentence for the distribution of heroin mixed with fentanyl be consecutive to any other sentence imposed.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-204, 2-207, 3-502, 5-602, 5-608, 5-608.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page