Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Lam, Beidle, Corderman, Feldman, Hettleman, Jackson, Klausmeier, Lee, Ready, Salling, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the sale of diapers, diaper rash cream, baby wipes, baby bottles, baby bottle nipples, and infant car seats from the sales and use tax.
Committees
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873024/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/30/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {533227/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Baby Products - Exemption
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page