Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsored by
Senators West and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum fees from $4 to $25 for an original notarial act and, subject to certain regulations, to $50 for performance of a notarial act using communication technology; repealing a certain prohibition on performing a notarial act using communication technology with respect to a will or a trust; authorizing a notary public to use communication technology to take an acknowledgement of a signature remotely under certain circumstances; establishing certain requirements for a notary public to confirm a record remotely; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0663
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (124-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page