Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for water efficiency projects, environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards, and resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a property to withstand the effects of climate change; adding water efficiency projects and environmental remediation and resiliency projects to the items requiring eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0517
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 11:18 AM