Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Elfreth, Feldman, Hayes, Kramer, Smith, Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership services on transit vehicles to any permanent employee in any unit of the Executive Branch of State government, including a unit with an independent personnel system; prohibiting the Administration from collecting fees or reimbursement for certain transit services; and requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation and the Department of Budget and Management to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the cost and feasibility of expanding the program.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0201
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387479/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387479/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {723823/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Withdrawn
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - State Employees Subject to Collective Bargaining - Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {387479/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {387479/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Floor Amendment {723823/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Referred Appropriations 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Withdrawn 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page