Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property that is used for certain hotel or residential development projects; and altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit in Wicomico County against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property that is used for certain hotel or residential development projects.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2024
Legislative Date
1/13/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects
Senate 1/13/2024 1/13/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Favorable Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/16/2024 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page