Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras (Body-Worn Camera Appropriation and Financing Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services, in coordination with the Department of Information Technology, to negotiate contracts to acquire and maintain body-worn cameras, equipment, and technology at the request of a law enforcement agency; requiring the Department of Information Technology to coordinate with the Department of General Services to study the cost and feasibility of implementing a statewide uniform storage and access system for law enforcement body-worn camera data; and requiring a report on the study by December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras (Body-Worn Camera Appropriation and Financing Act of 2023)
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2023 3/02/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Favorable with Amendments {943420/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras (Body-Worn Camera Appropriation and Financing Act of 2023)
Senate 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Referred Judiciary 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page